SB22
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 13, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Authorizes a board of county commissioners to prescribe certain fees by ordinance. (BDR 20-281)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 14, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)