AB211
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 25, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Aizley, Ohrenschall, Carrillo, Horne, Atkinson, Conklin, Dondero Loop, Frierson, Goedhart, Hambrick, Hogan, Oceguera, Pierce, Stewart, Leslie, Parks, Denis

Revises provisions governing discriminatory employment practices. (BDR 53-272)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 112.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 25, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 27, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 18, 2011   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 560   

Bill History

Feb 25, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 28, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Apr 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 02, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 04, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 07, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 560.) To printer.

May 09, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 10, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2011

May 13, 2011

  • In Assembly.

May 17, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 560 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 19, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 112.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.