AB14
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 13, 2010.
By: Taxation

Revises the provisions governing certain tax abatements for new or expanded businesses and renewable energy facilities. (BDR 32-283)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 22, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)