AB21
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Makes certain occupational licensing boards and commissions subject to the same requirements as other agencies of the Executive Department of the State Government. (BDR 31-409)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)