AB284
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin, Horne, Kirkpatrick

Revises provisions relating to real property. (BDR 9-1083)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 81.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 03, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 09, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 324   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 324.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.)
  • To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 09, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 10, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2011

May 13, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 20, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 81.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.