SB248
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Lee, Breeden, Copening, Denis, Horsford, Kihuen, Leslie, Manendo, Schneider, Wiener, Anderson

Revises provisions governing traffic laws relating to overtaking and passing bicycles and electric bicycles. (BDR 43-794)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 69.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     May 03, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 05, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 11, 2011   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 10, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2011

May 13, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 69.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.