AB23
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Commerce and Labor

Enacts the Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Compact. (BDR 57-473)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 25, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 04, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 145   

Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 145.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 14, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

May 23, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 118.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.