SB264
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie

Revises provisions concerning the regulation of certain medical facilities. (BDR 40-15)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 22, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 24, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee   Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2011     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 11, 2011     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 26, 2011     01:36 PM          Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 330     Amend. No. 636     Amend. No. CA2   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 330.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 636.) To printer.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.

May 26, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 636 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 27, 2011

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 636 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 636 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 323.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.