AB323
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin, Atkinson

Requires the establishment and maintenance of an Internet website to provide information concerning consumer fraud in this State. (BDR 52-313)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 04, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 220   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 220.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)