AB324
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hambrick

Revises provisions governing dangerous or vicious dogs. (BDR 15-223)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have fiscal impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 07, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)