SJR1
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to allow the Legislature to authorize the operation of a state lottery for the support of public education. (BDR C-68)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)