SB31
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Revenue

Makes various changes to provisions governing administration of taxes. (BDR 32-434)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 95.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Feb 15, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Mar 08, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 29, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue     May 13, 2011     11:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Mar 18, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 44     Amend. No. 121   

Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 44.) To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

Mar 21, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 121.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 16, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 121 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

May 19, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 95.
  • Section 9 effective May 24, 2011, and expires by limitation on June 30, 2011. Sections 1 to 8, inclusive, and 10 to 13, inclusive, effective July 1, 2011.