AB354
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Revises provisions relating to the State Personnel System. (BDR 23-1014)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Senate Natural Resources     May 11, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 25,   Nay 13,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 901   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 901.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 13, Excused: 4.)
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.
  • Sections 3 and 4 of this act effective June 17, 2011. Sections 1 and 1.3 of this act effective October 1, 2011. Section 1.7 of this act effective January 1, 2012.