SB32
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Revenue

Makes various changes relating to equalization of property valuations. (BDR 32-433)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 334.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Feb 15, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Mar 08, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     May 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 19, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Mar 18, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 45     Amend. No. 665   

Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 45.) To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

Mar 21, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 665.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 665 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 334.
  • Effective June 13, 2011.