SB33
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Revenue

Consolidates provisions requiring confidentiality of certain taxpayer-specific records. (BDR 32-435)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 160.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Feb 15, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Mar 08, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Taxation     May 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 19, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Mar 24, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 46   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 78   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 46   

Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 17, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Mar 23, 2011

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 78.) To printer.

Mar 24, 2011

Mar 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 160.
  • Effective May 30, 2011.