SB315
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer

Requires the Commission on Professional Standards in Education to provide for the licensure of teachers and administrators pursuant to an alternative route to licensure. (BDR 34-819)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 30, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 13, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May 09, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     May 18, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 290     Amend. No. 640   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 290.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 640.) To printer.

May 26, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 640 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.