SB320
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo

Revises provisions governing certain motor carriers. (BDR 58-1051)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 441.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation and rerefer
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 03, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 30,   Nay 11,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 884     Amend. No. 932   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 850   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 850.)
  • Action of adoption of amendment rescinded.
  • Amendment No. 884 adopted.
  • To printer.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 932.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 932 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 441.
  • Effective June 16, 2011, for the purposes of adopting regulations or performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and October 1, 2011, for all other purposes. Sections 3 and 4 of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who:(a) Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.