SB322
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer, Hardy, Manendo

Revises provisions governing motor vehicles. (BDR 43-1008)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 233.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 17, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 253   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 253.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 23, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 233.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.