SB323
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks

Revises provisions relating to motor vehicle liability insurance and registration. (BDR 43-421)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 280.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 03, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 05, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Transportation     May 10, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 461     Amend. No. 672   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 461.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 672.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

Jun 01, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 672 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 280.
  • Effective June 10, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and July 1, 2011, for all other purposes.