SB324
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer

Makes various changes concerning state financial administration. (BDR 31-748)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)