SB326
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee

Revises provisions relating to parks and recreation areas in this State. (BDR 20-393)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 30, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 05, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)