SB329
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden, Wiener

Revises provisions governing prescriptions. (BDR 54-904)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 358.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 403     Amend. No. 826   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 403.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 826.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 826 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 358.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.