SB37
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 14, 2010.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener

Makes various changes concerning complaints received by a health care licensing board. (BDR 54-106)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 223.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 23, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 25, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 21, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor, and Energy. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 16, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read second time.

Feb 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 21, 2011

Feb 22, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 223.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.