SB336
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Revises certain provisions relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 40-234)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 28, 2011     03:35 PM          Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation and rerefer
  Senate Finance     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 05, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 28, 2011

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)