SB337
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer, Copening

Revises provisions governing persons who may receive an anatomical gift. (BDR 40-1055)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 234.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 31, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 27, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 07, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 07, 2011

Apr 08, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 19, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 234.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.