SB341
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Copening, Schneider, Wiener, Breeden, Leslie, Manendo, Ohrenschall, Pierce

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a subcommittee to conduct an interim study concerning the establishment of a bank that is owned, controlled and operated by this State. (BDR S-870)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 26, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 05, 2011   Yea 10,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2011

  • EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Read second time.

Jun 05, 2011