SB344
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Horsford, Conklin, Hogan, Oceguera

Enacts the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote. (BDR 24-1269)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 07, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)