SB349
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horsford, Frierson, Horne, Neal

Provides for the establishment of a community court pilot project to provide an alternative to sentencing for misdemeanor offenders. (BDR S-387)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and rerefer
  Senate Finance     Apr 30, 2011     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     Jun 05, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 965   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 965.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • (No further action taken.)