SB42
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Transportation

Authorizes the testing of drivers of vehicles that cause fatal vehicle accidents or collisions for the presence of alcohol. (BDR 43-293)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Feb 24, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 03, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 497   

Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 31, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 25, 2011

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 497.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)