SB43
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes relating to electronic health records. (BDR 40-443)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 24, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 10, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 31, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 04, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 11, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 23, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 219   

Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 219.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 14, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2011

May 17, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.
  • Effective June 13, 2011.