Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

76th (2011) Session
Veto Messages




Messages from Governor Sandoval regarding 76th (2011) Session vetoed bills

  Bill
Message Date  
 
  AB135
June 1, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing probation. (BDR 14-806)
 
 
  AB136
June 16, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing credits for offenders sentenced for certain crimes. (BDR 16-634)
 
 
  AB137
June 16, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing programs of nutrition in public schools. (BDR 34-191)
 
 
  AB152
June 13, 2011 Veto Message
  Creates an advisory committee to develop recommendations for the funding of highways in this State. (BDR S-180)
 
 
  AB183
April 4, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions regarding the establishment and maintenance of a reserve account for payment of the outstanding bonds of a school district. (BDR 30-114)
 
 
  AB253
June 1, 2011 Veto Message
  Makes various changes concerning fines and settlement agreements relating to occupational safety and health. (BDR 53-100)
 
 
  AB254
June 1, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions relating to the issuance of a citation for certain occupational safety and health violations. (BDR 53-101)
 
 
  AB300
June 16, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing foreclosures on property. (BDR 9-668)
 
 
  AB301
June 16, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing the restoration of civil rights for ex-felons. (BDR 16-687)
 
 
  AB309
June 6, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing insurance. (BDR 57-516)
 
 
  AB416
June 17, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing certain programs for renewable energy. (BDR 58-849)
 
 
  AB433
June 17, 2011 Veto Message
  Expands prohibition on employers taking certain actions to prohibit, punish or prevent employees from engaging in politics or becoming candidates for public office with certain exceptions. (BDR 53-63)
 
 
  AB456
June 1, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing the attendance of pupils and graduation from high school. (BDR 34-1140)
 
 
  AB501
June 6, 2011 Veto Message
  Provides for an audit of the fiscal costs of the death penalty. (BDR S-1103)
 
 
  AB546
June 15, 2011 Veto Message
  Makes various changes to provisions governing early childhood care and education. (BDR 38-739)
 
 
  AB550
June 16, 2011 Veto Message
  Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning state ports of entry. (BDR S-892)
 
 
  AB566
May 31, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises the legislative districts from which members of the Senate and Assembly are elected and revises the districts from which Representatives of Congress are elected. (BDR 17-1287)
 
 
  AB568
May 16, 2011 Veto Message
  Ensures sufficient funding for K-12 public education for the 2011-2013 biennium. (BDR S-1292)
 
 
  AB578
June 17, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises the interim committee structure of the Legislature. (BDR 17-942)
 
 
  SB115
June 17, 2011 Veto Message
  Provides requirements governing payment for the provision of certain services and care to patients and reports relating to those services and care. (BDR 40-192)
 
 
  SB188
June 16, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions relating to the work schedules of certain employees of the Department of Corrections. (BDR 23-699)
 
 
  SB207
June 13, 2011 Veto Message
  Authorizes the imposition of an administrative penalty against an employer under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-165)
 
 
  SB208
June 14, 2011 Veto Message
  Creates the Task Force on Employee Misclassification. (BDR 53-164)
 
 
  SB254
June 17, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions relating to common-interest communities. (BDR 10-264)
 
 
  SB304
June 17, 2011 Veto Message
  Provides for redistricting of election districts in Carson City and the Cities of Henderson, Reno and Sparks, contingent upon voter approval. (BDR S-731)
 
 
  SB360
June 15, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing redevelopment agencies. (BDR 22-937)
 
 
  SB418
June 17, 2011 Veto Message
  Creates a subcommittee of the Legislative Committee on Health Care to oversee the implementation of federal health care reform in this State. (BDR 40-695)
 
 
  SB497
May 14, 2011 Veto Message
  Revises the legislative districts from which members of the Senate and Assembly are elected and revises the districts from which Representatives of Congress are elected. (BDR 17-1289)
 
 


Messages from Governor Gibbons regarding 26th (2010) Special Session vetoed bills

  SB3** March 10, 2010 Veto Message
  Revises provisions relating to governmental administration. (BDR S-16)
 
 


Messages from Governor Gibbons regarding 75th (2009) Session vetoed bills

  AB130*
June 9, 2009 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing metropolitan police departments. (BDR 22-632)
 
 
  AB395*
June 4, 2009 Veto Message
  Provides for workplace relations discussions and agreements for certain state employees. (BDR 23-1020)
 
 
  AB451*
June 9, 2009 Veto Message
  Establishes a program for the investment of state money in certificates of deposit at a reduced rate to provide lending institutions with money for reduced-rate loans to certain small businesses in this State. (BDR 31-613)
 
 
  AB503*
June 9, 2009 Veto Message
  Creates an advisory committee to develop recommendations for the funding of highways in this State. (BDR S-954)
 
 
  SB143*
June 9, 2009 Veto Message
  Makes an appropriation to the Interim Finance Committee for allocation to pay costs relating to the implementation of certain legislation. (BDR S-1034)
 
 
  SB376*
June 4, 2009 Veto Message
  Makes various changes relating to the prevailing wage requirements. (BDR 28-730)
 
 
  SB396*
June 9, 2009 Veto Message
  Revises provisions governing an investigation of a peace officer by a law enforcement agency. (BDR 23-1098)
 
 



Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo