AB571
Introduced in the Assembly on May 20, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Revises provisions governing prohibitions on smoking tobacco. (BDR 15-1294)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 06, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 23,   Nay 19,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 924   

Bill History

May 20, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

May 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 924.) To printer.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 19.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
  • Action reconsidered.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.
  • Sections 1, 3, and 4 of this act effective June 17, 2011. Section 2 of this act becomes effective one minute after June 17, 2011.