ACR11
Introduced in the Assembly on May 23, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Amends the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 76th Session of the Nevada Legislature to extend the second House passage deadline from May 27, 2011, until May 30, 2011. (BDR R-1297)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government:
Effect on State:

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 34.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

May 23, 2011

  • Resolution read and adopted. To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Resolution read.
  • Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2011

  • Resolution adopted.
  • To Assembly.

May 26, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • To printer. From printer.
  • To enrollment.

May 28, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 34.