SR5
Introduced in the Senate on May 30, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Designates Senate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2011-2013 biennium. (BDR R-1299)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government:
Effect on State:

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 40.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Be adopted

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

May 30, 2011

  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 01, 2011

  • From committee: Be adopted.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Resolution read and adopted.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 40.