SB501
Introduced in the Senate on May 31, 2011.
By: Finance

Authorizes the creation of an event facility district in certain counties. (BDR 22-1301)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Jun 02, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Jun 02, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes      Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     Jun 03, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     Jun 04, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue     Jun 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

May 31, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)