SB456
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions relating to operators of tow cars. (BDR 58-1089)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 380.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 05, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 09, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 16, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 29, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 245     Amend. No. 701   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 245.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 701.) To printer.

May 23, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 701 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 380.
  • Effective June 2, 2013.