SB56
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2012.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions governing state financial administration. (BDR 18-378)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 463.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 25, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 27, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May 24, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 30, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Jun 01, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 877   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2012

  • Prefiled. Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 27, 2012

  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Feb 27, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 28, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Read second time.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee.

May 27, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 877.) To printer.

May 28, 2013

May 29, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Jun 01, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 02, 2013

Jun 03, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 463.
  • Effective June 10, 2013. Sections 29 and 30 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2049.