SB72
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 17, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo

Makes various changes concerning cruelty to animals. (BDR 50-114)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 401.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 12, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 09, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 02, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 16, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May 28, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 33,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 516     Amend. No. 688     Amend. No. 836   

Bill History

Jan 17, 2013

  • Prefiled.

Jan 18, 2013

  • Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
  • To printer.

Jan 22, 2013

  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 516.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 25, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 21, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 688.) To printer.

May 22, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 23, 2013

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 836.) To printer.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 688 and 836 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 401.
  • Effective June 3, 2013.