SJR15* of the 76th (2011) Session
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 04, 2013.
By: Revenue and Economic Development

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove the separate tax rate and manner of assessing and distributing the tax on mines and the proceeds of mines. (BDR C-1151)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 40.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 22, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 26, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 02, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     May 02, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Taxation     May 16, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2013     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Taxation     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After passage discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 01, 2013   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2013   Yea 26,   Nay 15,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 04, 2013

  • Returned from Secretary of State.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 28, 2013

  • Read second time.

Apr 01, 2013

Apr 02, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 28, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 40.
  • On 2014 Ballot.