SB76
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 31, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer

Revises provisions governing permits to carry concealed firearms. (BDR 15-37)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 255.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 27, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 04, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2013   Yea 34,   Nay 5,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 683   

Bill History

Jan 31, 2013

  • Prefiled.
  • Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
  • To printer.

Feb 01, 2013

  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Feb 28, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 01, 2013

  • Read second time.

Mar 04, 2013

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 20, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 683.) To printer.

May 21, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 683 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 255.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.