AB143
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Fiore, Wheeler, Paul Anderson, Hansen, Hickey, Carrillo, Duncan, Ellison, Grady, Hambrick, Hardy, Kirner, Ohrenschall, Oscarson, Stewart, Woodbury, Gustavson, Settelmeyer, Cegavske, Goicoechea, Hammond, Hardy

Makes various changes relating to concealed firearms. (BDR 20-615)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 25, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 03, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 12, 2013     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)