AB145
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carrillo, Ohrenschall

Provides for retrofitting of roads and streets in consideration of different types of users. (BDR 43-662)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 472.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 07, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 21, 2013     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 20, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 31, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 02, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 63     Amend. No. 800     Amend. No. 932   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 11, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 63.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

May 27, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 800.) To printer.

May 28, 2013

May 29, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

Jun 01, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 932.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2013

Jun 05, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 472.
  • Effective June 11, 2013, for the purposes of the adoption of regulations and any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act. Effective for all other purposes on: (a) October 1, 2015; or (b) the date on which the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles, pursuant to section 16.5 of this act, notifies the Governor and the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau that sufficient resources are available to enable the Department to carry out the amendatory provisions of this act, whichever occurs first.