SB18
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 19, 2012.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes to provisions governing the Office of the Military, Nevada National Guard, Nevada National Guard Reserve and volunteer military organizations licensed by the Governor. (BDR 36-316)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 254.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 18, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 04, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 01, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 17, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 16     Amend. No. 716   

Bill History

Dec 19, 2012

  • Prefiled. Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 27, 2012

  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 16.) To printer.

Apr 05, 2013

Apr 09, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013

Apr 16, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 716.) To printer.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 716 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 254.
  • Effective May 29, 2013.