SB192
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 26, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske, Hutchison, Hammond, Hardy, Denis, Ford, Goicoechea, Gustavson, Jones, Kieckhefer, Kihuen, Parks, Roberson, Segerblom, Settelmeyer, Smith, Woodhouse, Fiore, Duncan, Hardy, Grady, Hambrick, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Kirner, Oscarson, Stewart, Woodbury

Enacts the Nevada Preservation of Religious Freedom Act to prohibit governmental entities from substantially burdening the exercise of religion. (BDR 3-477)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 13, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 379   

Bill History

Feb 26, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 379.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 22, 2013

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 18, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)