AB181
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 01, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien, Kirkpatrick, Eisen, Elliot Anderson, Frierson, Aizley, Benitez-Thompson, Carlton, Cohen, Daly, Dondero Loop, Healey, Ohrenschall, Pierce, Spiegel, Swank, Denis, Atkinson, Jones, Smith

Makes various changes to provisions governing employment practices. (BDR 53-48)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 548.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 08, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 20, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 27, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 24, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 15, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 26, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 21, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Conference Committee
Jun 01, 2013 06: 00 PM Conference Report


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 651     Amend. No. CA1   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 04, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 21, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read second time.

Mar 26, 2013

Mar 27, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 20, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 651.) To printer.

May 21, 2013

May 22, 2013

  • In Assembly.

May 27, 2013

  • Senate Amendment No. 651 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 28, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2013

  • Senate Amendment No. 651 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 31, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 651 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 05, 2013

  • To printer.

Jun 06, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 548.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.