AB195
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 04, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ellison, Wheeler, Oscarson, Fiore, Carrillo, Grady, Hambrick, Hansen, Hickey, Livermore, Martin, Munford, Ohrenschall, Stewart, Woodbury, Gustavson, Goicoechea

Revises provisions governing applications for the renewal of permits to carry concealed firearms. (BDR 15-446)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 03, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 05, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 24, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 08, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 21, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 23, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 166   

Bill History

Mar 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 05, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 11, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 166.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 15, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 09, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 14, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2013

May 17, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 27, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 28, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Jun 04, 2013

  • (No further action taken.)