AB196
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 04, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wheeler, Ellison, Paul Anderson, Fiore, Oscarson, Duncan, Grady, Hansen, Hardy, Hickey, Kirner, Livermore, Stewart, Woodbury, Gustavson, Cegavske, Settelmeyer

Requires the Attorney General to bring an action to protect and secure certain constitutional rights of residents of this State under certain circumstances. (BDR 18-945)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 15, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 05, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 11, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)