SB213
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 04, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Manendo, Spearman, Segerblom, Woodhouse, Carlton, Ohrenschall, Martin, Munford, Pierce

Revises certain provisions relating to trapping. (BDR 45-450)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 231.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 28, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 09, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 11, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 07, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 16, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May 23, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 21, 2013   Yea 27,   Nay 12,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 549     Amend. No. 690   

Bill History

Mar 04, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 05, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 549.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 25, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 20, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 690.) To printer.

May 21, 2013

May 22, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 24, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment No. 690 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor.
  • Chapter 231.
  • Sections 1, 2, 4, 5 and 6 of this act become effective May 28, 2013. Section 3 of this act becomes effective May 28, 2013 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 31, 2013, for all other purposes.