AB230
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien, Eisen, Sprinkle, Elliot Anderson, Hambrick, Aizley, Benitez-Thompson, Horne, Kirkpatrick, Neal, Spearman, Parks, Segerblom, Manendo

Revises provisions governing courses of instruction in sex education. (BDR 34-1034)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 01, 2013     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 06, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 10, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 23, 2013   Yea 26,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0,  Vacant 1


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 270     Amend. No. 752   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 12, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 270.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

Apr 24, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 752.) To printer.

May 23, 2013

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 25, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)