AB234
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horne, Frierson, Flores, Eisen, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Healey, Pierce, Segerblom, Spearman, Atkinson, Kihuen

Revises provisions relating to firearms. (BDR 15-915)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 03, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 12, 2013     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 18, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 11, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 12, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2013

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)